IL SB2092 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Changes the Rental Housing Support Program State surcharge a county recorder must collect on each real-estate related document from $9 to $18. Makes conforming changes.
Title
RENTAL HOUSING SUPPORT FEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 003-003-003 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 3-5018 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-5018.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 4-12002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 4-12002.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2092&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2092.htm |