IL SB2084 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Authorizes the Illinois Commerce Commission to extend the time for considering a certificate of service authority request by an alternative retail electric supplier under specified circumstances. Adds to the findings the Commission must make when granting a certificate of service authority for an alternative retail electric supplier. Requires an alternative retail electric supplier and an alternative gas supplier to provide the Commission and Attorney General the rates it charged to residential customers in the prior quarter. Requires an alternative retail electric supplier's marketing materials that include a price per kilowatt-hour for competitive electricity service include a specific statement that the alternative retail electric supplier is not the same entity as the customer's electric utility delivery company and directing the customer to the Commission's website. Requires an alternative retail electric supplier to provide notices to residential customers concerning certain rate changes. Provides that complaints against an alternative retail electric supplier may be filed with the Commission. Provides that the Commission shall ensure alternative retail electric suppliers and alternative gas suppliers have proper training in place to prohibit impersonation of a utility, investigate complaints, and impose fines for each incident. Provides that the Commission may establish a program for promising expanded use of energy savings programs for residential and small commercial customers. Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. In provisions concerning electric service provider selection, provides that suppliers shall maintain and preserve an electronic version of third-party verifications if automated. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITIES-ELECTRIC SERVICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 10 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-115A | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-115B | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-118 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-119 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 19-115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 19-135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 20-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 20-140 | New Code | See Bill Text |
815 | 505 | 2EE | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2084&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2084.htm |