IL SB2082 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Torture Inquiry and Relief Commission Act. Changes the definition of "claim of torture" to include allegations of torture occurring throughout the State (rather than occurring within a county of more than 3,000,000 inhabitants). Provides that, subject to appropriation, the Illinois Torture Inquiry and Relief Commission shall employ a legal staff. Provides that the Act applies to any claims of torture filed after the effective date of the Act (rather than filed not later than 10 years after the effective date of the Act).
Title
TORTURE INQUIRY-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 40 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 40 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 40 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |