IL SB2076 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Natural Resources (Conservation) Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that any person hired by the Department of Natural Resources for a sworn law enforcement position or position that has arrest authority must at the time of hire, be not less than 20 years of age and have successfully completed an associate's degree or 60 credit hours at an accredited college or university. Provides that any person so hired shall not have power of arrest, nor shall he or she be permitted to carry firearms, until he or she reaches 21 years of age (rather than at the time of hire, the person must be not less than 21 years of age, or 20 years of age and have successfully completed an associate's degree or 60 credit hours at an accredited college or university, and any person hired after successful completion of an associate's degree or 60 credit hours at an accredited college or university shall not have power of arrest, nor shall he or she be permitted to carry firearms, until he or she reaches 21 years of age). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONSERVATION POLICE-STANDARDS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2023-03-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
2023-03-10SenateSecond Reading
2023-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
2023-03-09SenateDo Pass State Government; 009-000-000
2023-02-21SenateAssigned to State Government
2023-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2023-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2080563b2.2Amended CodeCitation Text
20805805-535Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback