IL SB2076 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0367
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Code of Military Justice. Makes conforming changes so as to parallel the federal Uniform Code of Military Justice. Makes changes to provisions concerning conviction of offense charged; conspiracy; desertion; disrespect toward superior commissioned officer; and other matters. Adds provisions concerning malingering; breach of medical quarantine; resistance, flight, breach of arrest, and escape; offenses against correctional custody and restriction; prohibited activities with military recruit or trainee by person in position of special trust; offenses by sentinel or lookout; disrespect toward sentinel or lookout; misconduct as prisoner; public records offenses; fraudulent enlistment, appointment, or separation; unlawful enlistment, appointment, or separation; forgery; false or unauthorized pass offenses; impersonation of officer; wearing unauthorized insignia; parole violation; mail matter; leaving scene of vehicle accident; communicating threats; death or injury of an unborn child; child endangerment; rape and sexual assault; rape and sexual assault of a child; other sexual misconduct; receiving stolen property; offenses concerning Government computers; frauds against the United States; and other matters. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MILITARY JUSTICE-UNIFORM CODE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0367
2019-08-09SenateEffective Date August 9, 2019
2019-08-09SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-21SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-05-23HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Charles Meier
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2019-05-23SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-000-000
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2019-05-01HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2019-05-01HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-000-000
2019-04-25HouseTo Commercial Law Subcommittee
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-27HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2019-03-27HouseArrived in House
2019-03-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-000-000
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Brian W. Stewart
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Brian W. Stewart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
201807100Amended CodeCitation Text
201807101Amended CodeCitation Text
201807102Amended CodeCitation Text
201807103Amended CodeCitation Text
201807103aNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807103bNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807104Amended CodeCitation Text
201807104aNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807104bNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807105Amended CodeCitation Text
201807105aNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807106Amended CodeCitation Text
201807106aAmended CodeCitation Text
201807107Amended CodeCitation Text
201807107aNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807108aNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807109aNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807110Amended CodeCitation Text
201807111Amended CodeCitation Text
201807112Amended CodeCitation Text
201807113Amended CodeCitation Text
201807114Amended CodeCitation Text
201807115Amended CodeCitation Text
201807118Amended CodeCitation Text
201807119Amended CodeCitation Text
201807119aNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807119bNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807120Amended CodeCitation Text
201807120aNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807120bNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807120cNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807121Amended CodeCitation Text
201807121aNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807122Amended CodeCitation Text
201807122aNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807123Amended CodeCitation Text
201807123aAmended CodeCitation Text
201807124Amended CodeCitation Text
201807124aNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807124bNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807125Amended CodeCitation Text
201807126Amended CodeCitation Text
201807127Amended CodeCitation Text
201807128Amended CodeCitation Text
201807128aNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807129Amended CodeCitation Text
201807130Amended CodeCitation Text
201807131Amended CodeCitation Text
201807131aNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807131bNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807131cNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807131dNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807131eNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807131fNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807131gNew CodeSee Bill Text
201807132Amended CodeCitation Text
201807133Amended CodeCitation Text
201807134Amended CodeCitation Text
20180779Amended CodeCitation Text
20180781Amended CodeCitation Text
20180782Amended CodeCitation Text
20180783Amended CodeCitation Text
20180784Amended CodeCitation Text
20180785Amended CodeCitation Text
20180787Amended CodeCitation Text
20180787aNew CodeSee Bill Text
20180787bNew CodeSee Bill Text
20180789Amended CodeCitation Text
20180790Amended CodeCitation Text
20180793aNew CodeSee Bill Text
20180794Amended CodeCitation Text
20180795Amended CodeCitation Text
20180795aNew CodeSee Bill Text
20180796Amended CodeCitation Text
20180798Amended CodeCitation Text
20180799Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback