IL SB2076 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that the regulation of the possession or ownership of a rifle or shotgun (rather than assault weapons) are exclusive powers and functions of this State. Provides that any ordinance or regulation, or portion of that ordinance or regulation, that purports to regulate the possession or ownership of any rifle or shotgun (rather than assault weapons) in a manner that is inconsistent with this Act, shall be invalid. Deletes provision that an ordinance or regulation enacted on, before, or within 10 days after the effective date of Public Act 98-63 (July 9, 2013) regulating the possession or ownership of assault weapons is valid. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIREARM OWNERS ID-PREEMPT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on Firearms
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4306513.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback