IL SB2074 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Conviction History Reporting Act. Prohibits a consumer reporting agency from reporting in a criminal history report (1) criminal history information that antedates the report by more than 5 years and (2) criminal history record information that is not conviction information. Authorizes the recovery of damages, punitive damages, and attorney's fees. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONVICTION HISTORY REPORT ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback