IL SB2072 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Gambling Act. Provides that nothing in the Act shall be interpreted to require a suppliers license for a third-party supplier of an amenities outlet or non-gaming operation or function or an occupational license for a person whose duties do not directly involve gaming activities and who is employed exclusively in an amenities outlet or operation. Provides that those people are exempt from licensure. Defines "amenities outlet or non-gaming operation or function".
Title
GAMING-LICENSES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-03-24 | Senate | To Executive- Gaming |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 10 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 10 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 10 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2072&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2072.htm |