IL SB2071 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Transforming, Helping, and Reviving Illinois' Versatile Economy (THRIVE) Job Creation Tax Credit Act. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall award an income tax credit to taxpayers that meet certain criteria. Contains job creation and capital investment requirements. Provides that the credit may not exceed 50% of the incremental income tax attributable to the applicant's project. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-THRIVE TAX CREDIT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-02-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355224New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback