IL SB2070 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the Specialty Farm Product Buyers Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SPECIALTY FARM PRODUCT BUYERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-04HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Agriculture; 010-000-000
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Agriculture
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
225660ActRepealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback