IL SB2068 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Local Library Act. Provides that before the Board of Library Trustees may commence construction, remodeling, repairing, or improving of a library building, it shall advertise for bids if the cost of the project exceeds $25,000 (currently, $20,000). Amends the Public Library District Act of 1991 making similar changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOC LIBRARY-ADVISORY QUESTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 016-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass as Amended Local Government; 006-000-000
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
751640-45Amended CodeCitation Text
7555-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback