IL SB2066 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0634
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that, beginning January 1, 2020 and through December 31, 2020, sales of tangible personal property made by a marketplace seller over a marketplace for which tax is due but for which use tax has been collected and remitted to the Department of Revenue by a marketplace facilitator are exempt. Provides that the term "marketplace facilitator" does not include any person licensed under the Auction License Act, other than any person who is an Internet auction listing service. Amends the Leveling the Playing Field for Illinois Retail Act. Provides that certified service providers who collect and remit taxes on behalf of retailers may claim the retailers' discount with respect to those taxes. Provides that the retailer is not entitled to the discount with respect to those taxes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RET OCC TX-MKTPLCE FACILITATOR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-27SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0634
2021-08-27SenateEffective Date August 27, 2021
2021-08-27SenateGovernor Approved
2021-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2021-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2021-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2021-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021
2021-05-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000
2021-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2021-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2021-04-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
2021-04-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2021-04-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2021-04-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2021-04-28HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2021-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-22HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-04-22HouseArrived in House
2021-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4 (a)
2021-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2021-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2021-04-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2021-04-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2021-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021
2021-04-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000
2021-04-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
2021-04-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2021-03-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-03-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2021-03-24SenatePostponed - Revenue
2021-03-16SenateAssigned to Revenue
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
351201Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback