IL SB2066 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0242
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Mandates Act. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity's catalog of state mandates shall also include a statewide cost of compliance estimate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GOV-UNFUNDED MANDATES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0242
2017-08-18SenateEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-18SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-24SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-012-002
2017-05-24HouseMotion Prevailed
2017-05-24HouseMotion - Move to Previous Question Rep. Chad Hays
2017-05-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cost Benefit Analysis Committee; 003-000-000
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Cost Benefit Analysis Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-04-26SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 010-000-000
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Commerce and Economic Development
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308057Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback