IL SB2063 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Limits a candidate for public office to one political committee, with certain exceptions. Limits annual campaign contributions to any one candidate for public office from an individual, corporation, labor union, association, or other group to an aggregate of $5,000, adjusted annually for inflation.
Title
CAMPAIGN CONTRIBUTION LIMIT
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Duffy [R] | Sen. Dale Righter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 3, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | To Executive Subcommittee on Ethics | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Executive Subcommittee on Ethics | |
2009-03-11 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-02-25 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Duffy | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2063&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB2063.htm |