IL SB2058 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Park District Code. Provides that a park district must permit the self-administration and self-carry of asthma medication by a program participant at an after-school program with asthma or the self-administration and self-carry of an epinephrine injector by a program participant at an after-school program if specified written authorization is provided to the park district. Requires park district employees or volunteers who have undergone training to administer specified asthma medication, epinephrine injectors, and opioid antagonists to after-school program participants unless the program participant indicates they will self-administer the medication. Requires a park district to immediately call local emergency medical services after administration of an epinephrine injector or an opioid antagonist and notify specified individuals after the administration of asthma medication, epinephrine injectors, and opioid antagonists. Limits the liability of park district employees, agents, and medical personnel writing prescriptions for after-school program participants. Provides that each park district shall adopt an asthma episode emergency response protocol. Defines terms. Makes other changes. Amends the Chicago Park District Act making conforming changes.
Title
: PARK DIST PROGRAMS-MEDICINES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Postponed-Local Government |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed-Local Government |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Local Policies |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Local Policies |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1205 | 8-25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1505 | 26.10-13 | New Code | See Bill Text |