IL SB2054 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that a licensee requesting a new concealed carry license shall submit $10 (rather than $75), of which $3 (rather than $60) shall be apportioned to the State Police Firearm Services Fund, $5 shall be apportioned to the Mental Health Reporting Fund, and $2 (rather than $10) shall be apportioned to the State Crime Laboratory Fund.
Title
CONCEALED CARRY-NEW LICENS FEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Firearms |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 66 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2054&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2054.htm |