IL SB2054 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that a licensee requesting a new concealed carry license shall submit $10 (rather than $75), of which $3 (rather than $60) shall be apportioned to the State Police Firearm Services Fund, $5 shall be apportioned to the Mental Health Reporting Fund, and $2 (rather than $10) shall be apportioned to the State Crime Laboratory Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONCEALED CARRY-NEW LICENS FEE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-04-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on Firearms
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4306660Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback