IL SB2053 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Requires that applications for certification, registration, and licensure must contain specific language that states that the applicant is not obligated to disclose sealed or expunged records of conviction or arrest and prohibits entities authorized to grant professional licenses, certifications, and registrations from asking if an applicant has had records sealed or expunged. Provides that certain sealed or impounded felony records shall not be disseminated in connection with an application for a professional or business license, registration, or certification, except specified health care worker licenses. Amends various professional licensing Acts with the following changes: Provides that the licensing agency must find that a license applicant has not committed certain acts or has been sufficiently rehabilitated to approve the application. Provides that the licensing agency shall not require applicants to report certain criminal history information and the licensing agency shall not consider the information. Requires the licensing agency to consider certain mitigating factors and evidence of rehabilitation for license applicants. Requires the licensing agency, upon denial of a license, to provide the applicant certain information concerning the denial. Provides that on May 1 of each year, the licensing agency shall prepare, publicly announce, and publish certain statistical information. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LICENSING-CRIMINAL HISTORY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20160510.1Amended CodeCitation Text
20160510.1bNew CodeSee Bill Text
20263012Amended CodeCitation Text
20263013Amended CodeCitation Text
210503.50Amended CodeCitation Text
210503.51New CodeSee Bill Text
22511525Amended CodeCitation Text
2251158.2New CodeSee Bill Text
2252019Amended CodeCitation Text
225209A.1New CodeSee Bill Text
22522735Amended CodeCitation Text
22522736New CodeSee Bill Text
2252301005Amended CodeCitation Text
2252301005-1New CodeSee Bill Text
2253095Amended CodeCitation Text
2253096New CodeSee Bill Text
22531013Amended CodeCitation Text
22531013.5New CodeSee Bill Text
22533012.5New CodeSee Bill Text
22533027Amended CodeCitation Text
22534515Amended CodeCitation Text
22534515.1New CodeSee Bill Text
2253732New CodeSee Bill Text
2253735Amended CodeCitation Text
22540174New CodeSee Bill Text
22540175Amended CodeCitation Text
22540720-11New CodeSee Bill Text
22540720-15Amended CodeCitation Text
22541275Amended CodeCitation Text
22541276New CodeSee Bill Text
22541511Amended CodeCitation Text
22541511.1New CodeSee Bill Text
22541523Amended CodeCitation Text
22542240Amended CodeCitation Text
22542245Amended CodeCitation Text
22542280Amended CodeCitation Text
22542285Amended CodeCitation Text
22542743New CodeSee Bill Text
22542785Amended CodeCitation Text
225443115Amended CodeCitation Text
22544345Amended CodeCitation Text
22544347New CodeSee Bill Text
2255715Amended CodeCitation Text
2255715.1New CodeSee Bill Text
2255745Amended CodeCitation Text
22560510Amended CodeCitation Text
2256054New CodeSee Bill Text
2256209Amended CodeCitation Text
2256209.3New CodeSee Bill Text
2256353.2Amended CodeCitation Text
2256353.3New CodeSee Bill Text
2256459Amended CodeCitation Text
2256459.4New CodeSee Bill Text
2256557Amended CodeCitation Text
2256557.1New CodeSee Bill Text
22574577New CodeSee Bill Text
22574580Amended CodeCitation Text
230153Amended CodeCitation Text
230153.1New CodeSee Bill Text
230202.1Amended CodeCitation Text
230202.2New CodeSee Bill Text
230251.2Amended CodeCitation Text
230251.2aNew CodeSee Bill Text
230307Amended CodeCitation Text
230307.1New CodeSee Bill Text
23556-2Amended CodeCitation Text
23556-2.5New CodeSee Bill Text
23557-1Amended CodeCitation Text
351304Amended CodeCitation Text
351304bAmended CodeCitation Text
351304cAmended CodeCitation Text
351304iNew CodeSee Bill Text
4204445Amended CodeCitation Text
4204446New CodeSee Bill Text
5555-10004Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-10004aNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback