IL SB2051 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-16 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-16 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $2,500,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the State Board of Education for the YouthBuild Illinois program. Effective July 1, 2021.
Title
$ST BD ED-YOUTHBUILD ILLINOIS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-16 | Senate | To Appropriations- Education |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2051&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/PDF/10200SB2051.pdf |