IL SB2049 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-03 - Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Metropolitan Pier and Exposition Authority for its FY 16 ordinary and contingent expenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$METRO PIER AND EXPO AUTHORITY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-03HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-01-03HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2016-06-30HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016
2016-05-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2016-05-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2016-05-26HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2016-05-26HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
2016-05-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2016-05-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2016-05-25HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 069-046-000
2016-05-25HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-05-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2016-05-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-05-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
2016-05-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2016-05-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-05-24HouseFirst Reading
2016-05-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-05-24HouseArrived in House
2016-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2016-05-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David S. Luechtefeld
2016-05-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2016-05-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2016-05-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2016-05-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2016-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2016-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Forby
2016-05-24SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2016-05-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2016-05-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2016-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2016-05-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby
2016-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2016-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby
2016-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2016
2016-05-03SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2015-10-10SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2015-07-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2015-07-15SenateSecond Reading
2015-07-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading July 15, 2015
2015-07-14SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2015-03-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2015-03-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback