IL SB2047 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Provides that in an investigation in which the alleged perpetrator of abuse or neglect is a school employee, including, but not limited to, a school teacher or administrator, and the recommendation is to determine the report to be indicated, in addition to other procedures as set forth and defined in Department rules and procedures, the employee's due process rights shall also include: (i) the right to a copy of the investigation summary; (ii) the right to review the specific allegations which gave rise to the investigation; and (iii) the right to an administrator's teleconference which shall be convened to provide the school employee with the opportunity to present documentary evidence or other information that supports his or her position and to provide information before a final finding is entered. Removes a provision requiring the Department of Children and Family Services to inform the school employee of his or her right: (a) to confront the accuser, if the accuser is 14 years of age or older; (b) to review the specific allegations which gave rise to the investigation; and (c) to review all materials and evidence that have been submitted to the Department in support of the allegation.
Title
DCFS-ABUSE RPT-SCHOOL EMPLOYEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 5 | 7.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2047&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2047.htm |