IL SB2046 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax checkoff for the Thriving Youth Income Tax Checkoff Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Fund. Provides that moneys in the Fund shall be used by the Department of Human Services for the purpose of making grants to providers delivering non-Medicaid services for community-based youth programs in the State. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-THRIVING YOUTH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2017
2017-05-31SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-016-000
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-05-30HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-05-24HouseReported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
2017-05-24HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-18HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-02HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-03-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Revenue; 008-000-000
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.878New CodeSee Bill Text
301056z-102New CodeSee Bill Text
355507GGGNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2046&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2046.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2046eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2046enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2046ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2046ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2046_04272017_083000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2046_05302017_052000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2046_05312017_104001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2046_05312017_104000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback