IL SB2044 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a check of the Statewide Sex Offender Database and Statewide Murderer and Violent Offender Against Youth Database must be conducted by the school district or regional superintendent, as applicable, once for every 5 years an applicant remains employed by a school district. Provides that no school board shall knowingly employ a person or knowingly allow a person to student teach who has been issued an indicated finding of abuse or neglect of a child by the Department of Children and Family Services under the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act or by a child welfare agency of another jurisdiction. Requires the State Board of Education to conduct random audits of Professional Educator Licensees to verify a licensee's fulfillment of required professional development hours. With regard to the conviction of certain offenses as grounds for disqualification for licensure or suspension or revocation of a license, provides that if the holder of a license or applicant for a license has been charged with attempting to commit, conspiring to commit, soliciting, or committing certain offenses, first degree murder, or a Class X felony or any offense committed or attempted in any other state or against the laws of the United States that, if committed or attempted in this State, would have been punishable as one or more of those offenses, the State Superintendent of Education shall immediately suspend the license or deny the application until the person's criminal charges are adjudicated through a court of competent jurisdiction. Makes other changes.
Title
SCH CD-EDUCATOR MISCONDUCT
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-21.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 24-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-84b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2044&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2044.htm |