IL SB2037 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on July 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-30 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on July 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-30 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Workers’ Compensation Commission for its FY 16 ordinary and contingent expenses.
Title
$WORKERS? COMPENSATION COMM
Sponsors
Sen. John Cullerton [D] | Sen. Heather Steans [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Donne Trotter [D] |
Rep. Michael Madigan [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-15 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 39 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-30 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2015-07-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto July 15, 2015 |
2015-07-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 039-015-001 |
2015-07-15 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto July 1, 2015 |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-06-22 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2015-05-29 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 066-050-000 |
2015-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2015-05-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2015-05-28 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2015-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2015-05-28 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 012-009-000 |
2015-05-28 | House | Motion Prevailed 069-045-000 |
2015-05-28 | House | Rep. Ron Sandack Object to the Motion, requests a Roll Call |
2015-05-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Appropriations-Human Services Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2015-05-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2015-05-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-05-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2015-05-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 033-025-000 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Cullerton |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Appropriations I; 009-005-000 |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations I |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |