IL SB2036 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that unless some other speed restriction is established under a Chapter in the Code governing rules of the road, the maximum speed limit outside an urban district for any vehicle is 60 miles per hour (rather than 55 miles per hour) on all highways, roads, and streets that do not have 4 or more lanes of traffic and are not interstate highways and 75 miles per hour (rather than 70 miles per hour) on Interstate Route 355, Interstate Route 80, and every interstate west of Interstate Route 355 and south of Interstate Route 80.
Title
VEH CD-SPEED LIMIT-INTERSTATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Re-assigned to Transportation |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (TR) |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Jil Tracy |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jim Oberweis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |