IL SB2036 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that unless some other speed restriction is established under a Chapter in the Code governing rules of the road, the maximum speed limit outside an urban district for any vehicle is 60 miles per hour (rather than 55 miles per hour) on all highways, roads, and streets that do not have 4 or more lanes of traffic and are not interstate highways and 75 miles per hour (rather than 70 miles per hour) on Interstate Route 355, Interstate Route 80, and every interstate west of Interstate Route 355 and south of Interstate Route 80.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-SPEED LIMIT-INTERSTATE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (TR)
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Transportation
2017-03-07SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Jil Tracy
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2017-03-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jim Oberweis
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jim Oberweis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-601Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback