IL SB2026 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that female and male condoms shall be taxed by the State at a rate of 1% (currently, 6.25%). Provides that the net revenue from the 1% tax collected from the sale of female and male condoms shall be deposited into the State and Local Sales Tax Reform Fund. Amends the Use Tax, Service Occupation Tax, and Service Occupation Use Tax Acts to make conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SALES TAX-REDUCED RATE-CONDOMS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
351053-10Amended CodeCitation Text
351053-5.5Amended CodeCitation Text
351059Amended CodeCitation Text
351103-10Amended CodeCitation Text
351103-5.5Amended CodeCitation Text
351109Amended CodeCitation Text
351153-10Amended CodeCitation Text
351153-5.5Amended CodeCitation Text
351159Amended CodeCitation Text
351202-10Amended CodeCitation Text
351202-5.5Amended CodeCitation Text
351203Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback