IL SB2024 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0364
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Apprenticeship Study Act. Creates the Apprenticeship Study. Requires the Department of Labor to conduct a study on the potential expansion of apprenticeship programs in this State and produce a report on its findings. Provides for the contents of the report. Requires the Department of Labor to submit its report with findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before June 1, 2020. Defines "Illinois Apprenticeship Plus Framework". Provides findings and purpose provisions. Repeals the Act on January 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

APPRENTICESHIP STUDY ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0364
2019-08-09SenateEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-09SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-21SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-05-23SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-05-01HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-04-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-04-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-04HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-27HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-03-27HouseArrived in House
2019-03-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Labor; 011-000-000
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Labor
2019-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback