IL SB2023 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Enterprise Zone Act. With respect to the application process, provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity may award partial points if the applicant demonstrates job creation and investment levels below the threshold set forth in the statute. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity may adjust the scoring for applicants that are located entirely within a county with a population of less than 300,000. Provides for provisional certification of substantially complete applications. Provides that an Enterprise Zone shall be decertified if the Department finds that 80% or more of the businesses receiving tax incentives failed to submit certain information. Makes other changes. Provides that the application process for Enterprise Zones that are scheduled to expire on or after January 1, 2022 shall begin 5 years (currently, 2 years) prior to the year in which the Zone expires. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ENTERPRISE ZONES-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-002-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 010-001-001
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Commerce and Economic Development
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
206554Amended CodeCitation Text
206554.1Amended CodeCitation Text
206555.1Amended CodeCitation Text
206555.2Amended CodeCitation Text
206555.3Amended CodeCitation Text
206558.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback