IL SB2020 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill. Further amends the Property Tax Code to provide that the purchaser or assignee of a certificate of purchase shall deliver the notice of the expiration of the period of redemption to the sheriff, the coroner, or the private detective, as applicable, for service not less than 5 months prior to the expiration of the period of redemption.
Title
PROP TX-SALE IN ERROR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 006-002-000 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Judiciary |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 21-240 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 21-310 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 21-330 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 22-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 22-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |