IL SB2019 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. Provides that the rates and minimum mandated wage increases for homemaker services shall be, at a minimum, as of January 1, 2019, a rate of $19.96 per hour, for a minimum wage of $12 per hour, and as of July 1, 2019, a rate of $21.64 per hour for a minimum wage of $13 per hour. Provides that rates in future State fiscal years shall be no lower than the rates in effect on July 1, 2019. Provides that in-home service provider agencies shall be required to certify to the Department on Aging that they are in compliance with the mandated wage increase for direct service workers. Provides that fringe benefits, including, but not limited to, any paid time off, payment for training, health insurance, travel, or transportation payment, shall not be reduced in relation to these rate increases. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AGING-HOMEMAKER SERVICES-WAGES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-03-22SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-03-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations I
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Appropriations I
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
201054.02Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback