IL SB2019 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. Provides that the rates and minimum mandated wage increases for homemaker services shall be, at a minimum, as of January 1, 2019, a rate of $19.96 per hour, for a minimum wage of $12 per hour, and as of July 1, 2019, a rate of $21.64 per hour for a minimum wage of $13 per hour. Provides that rates in future State fiscal years shall be no lower than the rates in effect on July 1, 2019. Provides that in-home service provider agencies shall be required to certify to the Department on Aging that they are in compliance with the mandated wage increase for direct service workers. Provides that fringe benefits, including, but not limited to, any paid time off, payment for training, health insurance, travel, or transportation payment, shall not be reduced in relation to these rate increases. Effective immediately.
Title
AGING-HOMEMAKER SERVICES-WAGES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations I |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations I |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 105 | 4.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |