IL SB2019 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Probation and Probation Officers Act. Provides that all records relating to the obligation, receipt, and use of public funds of the State or county for probation and court services shall be made available to the public for inspection and copying. Provides that the Supreme Court may by rule establish procedures governing public access to records and appropriate fees for copies of records. Provides that the procedures and fees shall not be more than those in the Freedom of Information Act. Effective immediately.
Title
PROBATION FUNDS-PUBLIC INSPECT
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Civil Rights |
2017-03-16 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Civil Rights |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |