IL SB2019 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Continuity of Patient Care for Immunosuppressant Drugs Act. Provides that a health insurance policy or health care service plan contract that covers immunosuppressant drugs may not limit, reduce, or deny coverage of immunosuppressant drugs if prior to the limitation, reduction, or denial of coverage the insured was using the drug and was covered under the policy or contract and the drug was covered under the policy or contract. Provides that nothing in the Act shall prohibit an insurer from making changes in its benefit design that applies to all covered drugs or from increasing cost-sharing obligations due to a percentage coinsurance payment that necessarily increases with an increase in the underlying drug prices.
Title
INS - CONTINUITY CARE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-13 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-12 | Postponed - Insurance | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Insurance | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2019&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB2019.htm |