IL SB2017 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates a deduction in an amount equal to the amount contributed by taxpayer during the taxable year to an ABLE account. Provides that the deduction shall not exceed $10,000 per taxpayer in any taxable year. Provides that the deduction is exempt from the Act's automatic sunset provision. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-ABLE CONTRIBUTIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-18HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-04-25SenateDo Pass Revenue; 006-000-000
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-01-30SenateRe-assigned to Revenue
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355203Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback