IL SB2014 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0502
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0502
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Transportation to develop a policy which ensures the safety of pedestrians and cyclists on roadways within the State. Establishes that improvements will be made during routine maintenance and within a distance of 1,000 feet of the maintenance work on any State road within a municipality to include high visibility signage, crosswalk improvements, curb bump outs, barrier protected bike lanes, and bus shelters. Requires the Department to submit a semi-annual report on pedestrian and bicycle safety improvements on non-highway State routes that have been initiated, are in progress, or are recently completed. Effective immediately.
Title
IDOT-SAFETY IMPROVEMENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-19 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-04 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0502 |
2023-08-04 | Senate | Effective Date August 4, 2023 |
2023-08-04 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2023-05-19 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation |
2023-05-16 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-16 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Mike Simmons |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 16, 2023 |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2023-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2023-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2023-05-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2023-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2023-05-11 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2023-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2023-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2023-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2023-05-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2023-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |
2023-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2023-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2023-04-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 010-000-000 |
2023-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |
2023-04-11 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2023-03-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-24 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2023-03-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2023-03-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 23, 2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Simmons |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |