IL SB2014 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health Early Action on Campus Act. Provides that if a public higher education institution issues student identification cards to its students, the institution must provide contact information for certain suicide prevention and mental health resources on each student identification card. Provides that if an institution does not issue student identification cards to its students, the institution must publish the contact information on its website. Effective July 1, 2022.
Title
HIGHER ED-MENTAL HEALTH-STU ID
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0373 |
2021-08-13 | Senate | Effective Date July 1, 2022 |
2021-08-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 111-000-000 |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-05-14 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Higher Education Committee; 009-000-000 |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cullerton |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 012-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 015-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 58 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |