IL SB2011 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that a registered pharmacist filling a prescription for an opioid substance listed in Schedule II may dispense the prescribed substance in a lesser quantity than the recommended full quantity indicated on the prescription if requested by the patient provided that the prescription complies with the requirements of the Act. Provides that the remaining quantity in excess of the quantity requested by the patient shall be void. Provides that if the dispensed quantity is less than the recommended full quantity, the pharmacist or his or her designee shall, within a reasonable time following a reduction in quantity but not more than 7 days, notify the prescribing practitioner of the quantity actually dispensed. Provides that nothing in this provision shall be interpreted to conflict with or supersede any other requirement established in the Act for a prescription of an opiate substance or any requirements or conditions for drug substitutions established in the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
CONTROLLED SUB-SCHED II
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 012-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 312 | Amended Code | Citation Text |