IL SB2008 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that if a generic equivalent for a brand name drug is approved by the federal Food and Drug Administration, plans that provide coverage for prescription drugs through the use of a drug formulary that are amended, delivered, issued, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2022 shall comply with specified requirements. Provides that the Department of Insurance may adopt rules to implement provisions concerning notice of change of drug formulary. In provisions concerning a contract between a health insurer and a pharmacy benefit manager, provides that a pharmacy benefit manager must update and publish maximum allowable cost pricing information according to specified requirements, must provide a reasonable administrative appeal procedure to allow pharmacies to challenge maximum allowable costs, and must comply with specified requirements if an appeal is denied. Sets forth provisions concerning pharmacy benefit manager contracts; specified requirements that a pharmacy benefit manager shall comply with; specified requirements that an auditing entity shall comply with when conducting a pharmacy audit; and specified requirements concerning pharmacy network access standards. Provides that a violation of specified provisions is an unfair method of competition and unfair and deceptive act or practice in the business of insurance. Sets forth provisions concerning applicability of the Pharmacy Benefit Managers Article of the Illinois Insurance Code, and provisions concerning fiduciary responsibility of a pharmacy benefit manager. Defines terms. Makes other changes. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Sets forth provisions concerning reimbursement of professional dispensing fees and acquisition costs for pharmacy providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS-PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2022-02-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2022-02-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2022-02-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2022-02-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2022-01-12SenatePostponed - Insurance
2022-01-05SenateRe-assigned to Insurance
2021-05-21SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-05-12SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Chapin Rose
2021-05-10SenateRe-assigned to Insurance
2021-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021
2021-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-05-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-04-30SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021
2021-04-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
2021-04-23SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
2021-04-21SenatePostponed - Insurance
2021-04-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-04-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2021-04-16SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021
2021-04-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2021-04-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2021-04-15SenatePostponed - Insurance
2021-04-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance
2021-04-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2021-04-14SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2021-04-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2021-04-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2021-04-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2021-03-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2021-03-24SenatePostponed - Insurance
2021-03-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey
2021-03-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2021-03-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
2021-03-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2021-03-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
2021-03-16SenateAssigned to Insurance
2021-03-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
2021-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2021-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2021-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2021-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
2021-03-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-03-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155155.37Amended CodeCitation Text
2155424Amended CodeCitation Text
2155513b1Amended CodeCitation Text
2155513b1.1New CodeSee Bill Text
2155513b1.3New CodeSee Bill Text
30555-36Amended CodeCitation Text
30555-5.12Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback