IL SB1997 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COURTS-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-02SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2018-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Criminal Law
2018-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-24SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2018-04-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Criminal Law
2018-04-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-04-19SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2018-04-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Criminal Law
2018-04-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-04-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-03-14SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054051-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback