IL SB1995 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires the State Board of Education to develop and implement a School Share Table Program, including guidelines for the use of share tables in schools for kindergarten through grade 12; defines "share tables". Provides that the Program shall be implemented as a part of any school-based child nutrition program administered by the State Board. Requires the guidelines for the use of share tables to be made available on the website of the State Board on or before January 1, 2024. Requires the use of share tables to comply with any applicable local and State health and food safety requirements. Provides for the adoption of rules. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SCH SHARE TABLE PROGRAM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07SenateSession Sine Die
2023-03-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2023-03-23SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023
2023-03-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023
2023-03-08SenatePostponed - Education
2023-02-21SenateAssigned to Education
2023-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2023-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.196New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback