IL SB1995 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Innovations for Transportation Infrastructure Act. Contains a statement of legislative policy. Defines terms. Adds provisions governing: authorization of project delivery methods; preconditions to commencement of procurement; procurement; evaluation and selection of proposals; project records; confidentiality; public disclosure; design-build contracts; construction manager/general contractor contracts; funding and financing; minority, disadvantaged, and women-owned businesses; acquisition of property; federal requirements; powers of the Department of Transportation and the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority; and rulemaking. Makes corresponding changes in the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois; Illinois Finance Authority Act; the Illinois Procurement Code; the Public Construction Bond Act; the Employment of Illinois Workers on Public Works Act; the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Women, and Persons with Disabilities Act; the Toll Highway Act; the Eminent Domain Act; and the Prevailing Wage Act. Provides that the provisions of the Act are severable. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INFRASTRUCTURE DESIGN BUILD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
2019-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2019-03-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019
2019-03-12SenateDo Pass Transportation; 017-000-000
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Transportation
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2027052705-233New CodeSee Bill Text
203501825-108New CodeSee Bill Text
305001-10.5New CodeSee Bill Text
305501.9New CodeSee Bill Text
305702.8New CodeSee Bill Text
305752.8New CodeSee Bill Text
6051011.2New CodeSee Bill Text
7353015-5-48New CodeSee Bill Text
8201302Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback