IL SB1995 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Innovations for Transportation Infrastructure Act. Contains a statement of legislative policy. Defines terms. Adds provisions governing: authorization of project delivery methods; preconditions to commencement of procurement; procurement; evaluation and selection of proposals; project records; confidentiality; public disclosure; design-build contracts; construction manager/general contractor contracts; funding and financing; minority, disadvantaged, and women-owned businesses; acquisition of property; federal requirements; powers of the Department of Transportation and the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority; and rulemaking. Makes corresponding changes in the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois; Illinois Finance Authority Act; the Illinois Procurement Code; the Public Construction Bond Act; the Employment of Illinois Workers on Public Works Act; the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Women, and Persons with Disabilities Act; the Toll Highway Act; the Eminent Domain Act; and the Prevailing Wage Act. Provides that the provisions of the Act are severable. Effective immediately.
Title
INFRASTRUCTURE DESIGN BUILD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-01-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 017-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2705 | 2705-233 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 3501 | 825-108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 1-10.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 550 | 1.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 570 | 2.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 575 | 2.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
605 | 10 | 11.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
735 | 30 | 15-5-48 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 130 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |