IL SB1994 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-22 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Emancipation of Minors Act. Removes language pertaining to homeless minors from provisions governing: purpose and policy; jurisdiction; rights and responsibilities of an emancipated minor; petitions; and hearings. Repeals the definition of "homeless minor" and "youth transitional housing program". Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that services provided by youth transitional housing programs may include a service assessment, individualized case management, and life skills training. Provides that a homeless minor is eligible if certain criteria are met. Provides that if a homeless minor voluntarily leaves or is dismissed from a youth transitional housing program prior to reaching the age of majority, the youth transitional housing program agency shall contact the comprehensive community based youth services agency that provided crisis intervention services to the eligible homeless minor to assist in finding an alternative placement for the minor. Provides that nothing in the new provisions shall be construed to require an eligible homeless minor to acquire the consent of a parent, guardian, or custodian to consent to a youth transitional housing program. Provides that an eligible homeless minor is deemed to have the legal capacity to consent to receiving housing and services from a licensed youth transitional housing program. Contains a statement of purpose.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HOMELESS MINOR-CONSENT;HOUSING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-22SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-03-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205054bAmended CodeCitation Text
750302Amended CodeCitation Text
750303-2.10Repealed CodeCitation Text
750303-2.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
750304Amended CodeCitation Text
750305Amended CodeCitation Text
750307Amended CodeCitation Text
750309Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback