IL SB1993 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on December 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1162
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on December 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1162
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Court of Claims Act. Absent an enacted appropriation in any State fiscal year, makes a continuing appropriation to the Court of Claims of all amounts necessary for the purposes of paying claims for time unjustly served in prisons of this State. Provides that if an appropriation for claims for unjust imprisonment is enacted on or after July 1 of any calendar year, the continuing appropriation shall discontinue for that State fiscal year, and the enacted appropriation shall supersede. Provides that the appropriation authority granted in the amendatory Act is valid for State fiscal years beginning on or after July 1, 2017.
Title
PRISONER CLAIMS-FUNDING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 33 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 33 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1162 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Effective Date December 20, 2018 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-11-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 044-000-000 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-11-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - November 28, 2018 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2018-11-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-11-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-11-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-11-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-11-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-033-002 |
2018-11-28 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-11-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-11-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-11-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-11-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-11-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-11-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-11-07 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-19 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-19 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-05-19 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass Appropriations II; 018-000-000 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations II |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 505 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |