IL SB1993 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Enrolled on November 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Court of Claims Act. Absent an enacted appropriation in any State fiscal year, makes a continuing appropriation to the Court of Claims of all amounts necessary for the purposes of paying claims for time unjustly served in prisons of this State. Provides that if an appropriation for claims for unjust imprisonment is enacted on or after July 1 of any calendar year, the continuing appropriation shall discontinue for that State fiscal year, and the enacted appropriation shall supersede. Provides that the appropriation authority granted in the amendatory Act is valid for State fiscal years beginning on or after July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PRISONER CLAIMS-FUNDING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 33 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-11-28SenateSenate Concurs
2018-11-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 044-000-000
2018-11-28Senate3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-11-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-11-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-11-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - November 28, 2018
2018-11-28SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2018-11-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-11-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-11-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-11-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-11-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-033-002
2018-11-28House3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-11-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-27HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-11-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-11-27SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-11-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-11-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-11-07HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-01-22SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-19HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-19HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-05-19HouseArrived in House
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017
2017-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-05-04SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Appropriations II; 018-000-000
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Appropriations II
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
70550524Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback