IL SB1993 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Court of Claims Act. Absent an enacted appropriation in any State fiscal year, makes a continuing appropriation to the Court of Claims of all amounts necessary for the purposes of paying claims for time unjustly served in prisons of this State. Provides that if an appropriation for claims for unjust imprisonment is enacted on or after July 1 of any calendar year, the continuing appropriation shall discontinue for that State fiscal year, and the enacted appropriation shall supersede. Provides that the appropriation authority granted in the amendatory Act is valid for State fiscal years beginning on or after July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PRISONER CLAIMS-FUNDING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-19HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-19HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-05-19HouseArrived in House
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017
2017-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-05-04SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Appropriations II; 018-000-000
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Appropriations II
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
70550524Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback