IL SB1991 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on August 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on August 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that for an applicant seeking a professional educator license who is enrolled in a program of study in an area of career or technical education defined as an area of identified staff shortages, as defined in the Higher Education Student Assistance Act, or a career and technical educator endorsement on an educator license with stipulations, the State Board of Education, in consultation with the State Educator Preparation and Licensure Board, shall adopt a test of work proficiency.
Title
AGRICULTURE EDUCATION SHORTAGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0118 |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Effective Date August 15, 2017 |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000 |
2017-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-17 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-08 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-05-08 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-000-000 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Bennett |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 009-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |