IL SB1989 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0537
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that through June 30, 2023 (instead of June 30, 2021), an annuitant may accept employment as a teacher without impairing his or her retirement status if that employment is not within the school year during which service was terminated and does not exceed 120 paid days or 600 paid hours in each school year. Makes a conforming change. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-TRS-RETURN TO SERVICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-20SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0537
2021-08-20SenateEffective Date August 20, 2021
2021-08-20SenateGovernor Approved
2021-06-25SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-27SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-27HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000
2021-05-26HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2021-05-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-13HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2021-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2021-04-26HouseArrived in House
2021-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2021-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2021-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2021-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2021-04-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
2021-04-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
2021-04-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
2021-04-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2021-04-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
2021-04-14SenateDo Pass Education; 011-000-000
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
2021-03-24SenatePostponed - Education
2021-03-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2021-03-16SenateAssigned to Education
2021-03-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40516-118Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback