IL SB1987 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Lawn Care Products Application and Notice Act. Provides that lawn markers shall be white and made of rigid material. Provides that, for applications to residential properties of 2 families or less, the applicator for hire shall be required to place on marker at a prominent location along the rear perimeter, unless access to the treated area is impassable because of a fence, wall, hedge, or natural topographic feature. Provides that failure to attempt to provide a specified notification shall be considered a violation subject to an administrative hearing. Effective on January 1, 2018.
Title
LAWN CARE PRODUCTS APPLICATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-08 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-01-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-01-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - January 8, 2019 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-12-29 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 28, 2018 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-11-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2018-11-28 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-11-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-11-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2018-11-26 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-11-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-11-20 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-000-000 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 010-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 65 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |